Trustees 13TH ITCHEN NORTH (ST JOHNS) HEDGE END SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 275337
Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Joshua Mori | Chair | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary Smith | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Kinloch | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Malcolm Gould | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GEORGE | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.