THE LEIGH TRUST

Charity number: 275372
Charity reporting is up to date (191 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 August 2021 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 August 2021 191 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 October 2020 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 06 October 2020 244 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 April 2019 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 16 April 2019 70 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 March 2018 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 19 March 2018 42 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 14 February 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 14 February 2017 9 days late Download