THE LEIGH TRUST

Charity number: 275372
Charity reporting is up to date (191 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £91.44k £90.04k £90.17k £90.68k £94.92k
Total expenditure £111.52k £133.73k £179.00k £257.46k £589.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A