MARWELL WILDLIFE

Charity number: 275433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.16m £12.63m £11.24m £12.44m £8.31m
Total expenditure £9.87m £10.52m £10.91m £11.71m £10.72m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.50m N/A N/A £760.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.47m £2.75m £1.40m £1.34m £1.86m
Income - Other trading activities £3.42m £3.48m £3.34m £3.85m £1.73m
Income - Charitable activities £6.22m £6.35m £6.45m £7.20m £4.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.20k £6.94k £3.96k £8.82k £2.69k
Income - Other £31.19k £47.77k £45.15k £39.34k £278.15k
Income - Legacies £37.82k £39.81k £217.49k £100.11k £63.22k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.48m £7.02m £7.37m £7.74m £7.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.39m £3.51m £3.54m £3.97m £3.20m
Expenditure - Governance £15.25k £15.25k £17.63k £16.00k £19.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0