MARWELL WILDLIFE

Charity number: 275433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pete Jakob Trustee 17 October 2014 None on record
David Pape Trustee 24 May 2016 None on record
DAVID STALKER Chair 17 October 2014 None on record
Richard Mark Charter Trustee 24 May 2016 None on record
NICOLA ROBINSON Trustee 22 November 2011 None on record
CHRISTOPHER LANGFORD Trustee 12 May 2009
HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT WILDLIFE TRUST Received: On time
KING GEORGE`S FIELD MARTYR WORTHY Received: On time
ITCHEN ABBAS AND AVINGTON VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
Diane Walkington Trustee 05 May 2020 None on record
Francis McCaffrey Trustee 24 May 2016 None on record
Dr MIRANDA STEVENSON MBA Trustee 22 October 2013
WILDLIFE VETS INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
BARRY WATSON Trustee 03 May 2006
THE LATIMER CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Andrew Warren Trustee 05 May 2020 None on record
TERESA FROST Trustee 22 November 2011 None on record