ALL SAINTS CENTENARY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 275500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 February 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 12 February 2019 10 January 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 12 February 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 12 February 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 12 February 2016 24 January 2017 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 February 2016 Not Required