OXFORD CALEDONIAN PIPES AND DRUMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
play to the public and pratice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 April 1978: Standard registration
- OXFORD (CALEDONIAN) PIPE BAND (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Claxton | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janet Knight | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Sutherland | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
IAN KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.10k | £0 | £100 | £251 | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.63k | £50 | £50 | £0 | £505 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 26TH FEBRUARY 1978
Charitable objects
(A) TO EDUCATE, ENCOURAGE AND TEACH THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF SCOTTISH PIPE BAND MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, AND RELATED ACTIVITIES. FOR FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE. (B) TO PROVIDE A BAND FOR RECREATIONAL AND CHARITY PURPOSES IN SUPPORT OF LOCAL CHARITY, HOSPITAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE ORGANISATIONS. (C) TO BE REGISTERED MEMBERS OF THE SCOTTISH PIPE BAND ASSOCIATION (S.P.B.A.) AND TO PARTICIPATE IN TRAINING/EDUCATIONAL PROGAMMES ORGANISED/ARRANGED BY THE S.P.B.A. (D) TO PARTICIPATE, WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN COMPETITIONS HELD UNDER S.P.B.A. RULES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Links Road
Kennington
OXFORD
OX1 5RU
- Phone:
- 01865863532
- Email:
- JOHNCLAXTON56@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window