KEYNSHAM AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide leisure and holiday opportunities for children and adults with learning and physical disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 April 1978: Standard registration
- KEYNSHAM MENCAP (Working name)
- KEYNSHAM AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kath Dawson | Chair | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL JANE THOMPSON | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Powell | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charley Davis | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Marchant | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kristy Lorna Tyack | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
RUSS POCOCK | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Lloyd | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.02k | £108.50k | £204.25k | £173.15k | £218.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.33k | £110.31k | £178.37k | £187.85k | £192.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £10.00k | £11.35k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST FEBRUARY 1978 AND 12TH MAY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDENTS AND CARERS. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. “LEARNING DISABILITY” MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Area of benefit
KEYNSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 BATH HILL
KEYNSHAM
BRISTOL
BS31 1HG
- Phone:
- 01179865659
- Email:
- info@keynshammencap.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window