THE SWAN MOUNTAIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants of money to organisations actively involved in the support and care of refugees and asylum seekers, with special reference to those with mental health problems and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 May 1978: Standard registration
- SWAN MOUNTAIN (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Rosemary Harvie-Clark | Chair | 14 November 1977 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Simon Cowan | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Tom Barnaby Harvie-Clark | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Cowan | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kilgarriff | Trustee | 30 June 1991 |
|
|
||||
DODIE CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.69k | £55.42k | £61.47k | £57.53k | £133.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.91k | £42.43k | £50.42k | £64.60k | £75.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 8TH JULY 1996
Charitable objects
APPLICATION TO SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 MOUNT VERNON
LONDON
NW3 6QS
- Phone:
- 01235 861326
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window