ENFIELD AND DISTRICT VETERAN VEHICLE TRUST

Charity number: 275684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 29 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 September 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 28 September 2020 120 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 20 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 20 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 26 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 26 March 2017 On time Download