ENFIELD AND DISTRICT VETERAN VEHICLE TRUST

Charity number: 275684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £354.83k £155.71k £152.64k £182.42k £63.59k
Total expenditure £205.91k £216.37k £181.39k £139.59k £82.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k