MRS L D ROPE'S SECOND CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 275810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £145.24k £85.97k £107.01k £125.38k £117.33k
Total expenditure £112.62k £99.38k £75.48k £77.65k £88.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A