Financial history THE RIVER TRUST

Charity number: 275843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £57.22k £88.22k £87.71k £84.98k £116.79k
Total expenditure £106.44k £141.64k £147.68k £114.34k £145.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A