Accounts and annual returns THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST

Charity number: 275946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window