Financial history THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST

Charity number: 275946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £650.00k £1.77m £6.66m £104.41m £133.23m
Total expenditure £64.28k £91.04k £1.98m £4.01m £27.32m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £650.00k £1.77m £6.66m £104.41m £133.23m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.03m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £64.28k £91.04k £1.98m £4.01m £27.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.79k £9.26k £21.85k £40.69k £55.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £1.74m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0