Governance THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST

Charity number: 275946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 22 May 1978: Standard registration
  • 15 April 2020: Funds received from 1066081 LONDON, UXBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 15 June 2020: Funds received from 1065514 COLCHESTER WELSHWOOD PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 07 September 2020: Funds received from 260984 AYLESBURY SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 08 September 2020: Funds received from 1067192 CHALFONT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 22 September 2020: Funds received from 1067705 RHYL, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 06 October 2020: Funds received from 1066335 LONDON JAPANESE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 14 October 2020: Funds received from 1066113 WINSFORD, MIDDLEWICH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 30 October 2020: Funds received from 254812 HORNCHURCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 06 November 2020: Funds received from 1080736 LEAMINGTON SPA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 19 November 2020: Funds received from 1066130 KINGSWINFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 21 November 2020: Funds received from 1066334 NOTTINGHAM, BILBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 21 November 2020: Funds received from 257161 RICKMANSWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 09 December 2020: Funds received from 1066350 MANCHESTER, FARNWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 14 December 2020: Funds received from 1065500 CRAWLEY, BROADFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 06 January 2021: Funds received from 1067481 LONDON, MARYLEBONE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 26 April 2021: Funds received from 1065495 CROWBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 29 April 2021: Funds received from 1065790 LONDON CANTONESE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 11 May 2021: Funds received from 254485 HITCHIN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 12 August 2021: Funds received from 1067021 OXFORD CHERWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 27 September 2021: Funds received from 1066255 PRESTON, BAMBER BRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 07 October 2021: Funds received from 1066139 HULL, PEARSON PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 11 October 2021: Funds received from 1065411 GLASTONBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 245949 COVENTRY, WALSGRAVE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 246598 KETTERING NORTHFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 253673 HODDESDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254073 SOUTHEND ON SEA LEIGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254074 BILLINGHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254076 WOLVERHAMPTON (WEDNESFIELD) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254077 WOKING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254477 ABERDARE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254479 BOURNEMOUTH BOSCOMBE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254480 BRADFORD SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254482 ECKINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254483 EXETER (COWICK) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254484 GRIMSBY YARBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254486 HOLMFIRTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254488 LONDON GALLIONS REACH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254489 LONDON (CHINGFORD) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254490 LONDON EPSOM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254491 LONDON KILBURN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254492 LONDON PECKHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254493 LONDON RUISLIP CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254494 LONDON, SIDCUP CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254496 LONDON WIMBLEDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254497 LONDON WOODFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254498 MAGHULL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254499 MANCHESTER URMSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254500 MIDDLESBOROUGH NORTH ORMESBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254501 ORMSKIRK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254504 SLOUGH EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254506 SUTTON COLDFIELD, FOUR OAKS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254509 YEOVIL HENDFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254698 WHITSTABLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254811 LEIGHTON BUZZARD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254813 BRIGHTON SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255264 HALIFAX TOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255295 LONDON FULHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255317 LONDON HORNSEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255558 Tamworth, North Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesse...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255632 CANNOCK HEDNESFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255849 WORTHING TARRING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255850 Portsmouth Central Congregation of Jehovah's Witne...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255851 LONDON DALSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255852 ALTRINCHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256092 BAKEWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256093 LONDON EALING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256562 KINGS LYNN SEABANK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256593 BIRMINGHAM ERDINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256594 NORTH SHIELDS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256595 LONDON GREENFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256597 BIRMINGHAM WINSON GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 256780 RIPLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 257162 LONDON, SOUTHALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 257163 CRADLEY HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 257164 GRAYS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 257166 LONDON STEPNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 257242 MANCHESTER (RADCLIFFE) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 257792 LONDON COULSDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 258327 HIGH WYCOMBE HUGHENDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 258884 BIRMINGHAM HALL GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 259391 LONDON (TEDDINGTON) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 260083 BURY ST EDMUNDS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 260913 ROYSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 261119 LONDON HAYES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 261824 PLYMOUTH PLYMSTOCK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 262240 OXHEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 268690 ILFRACOMBE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 281687 WICKFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 283260 SUDBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 290853 THE CLEVEDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 297367 MARCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 501436 NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE, BENWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 501453 LIVERPOOL DINGLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 505451 KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 515202 MILLOM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 515299 STAFFORD NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 516165 THE SHEFFIELD WOODHOUSE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 519250 TELFORD-WELLINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1011649 SUTTON COLDFIELD WYNDLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1041840 DUDLEY GORNAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065117 LEEDS, HOLBECK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065118 LEICESTER, FOREST EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065120 LEICESTER PARKS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065123 LEICESTER WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065124 Leicester East Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065126 WIDNES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065127 LINCOLN CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065128 LINCOLN CARHOLME CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065130 BIRMINGHAM STECHFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065131 WEST BROMWICH, CARTERS GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065132 LINCOLN DANESGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065133 LINCOLN HYKEHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065134 BIRMINGHAM SMALL HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065135 WASHINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065137 ACCRINGTON MILNSHAW PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065138 NORTH WINGFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065139 BIRMINGHAM PHEASEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065141 WARWICK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065142 NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME CHESTERTON CONGERGATION OF JE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065143 SHEFFIELD GLEADLESS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065145 WALSALL, DARLASTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065146 NOTTINGHAM ARNOLD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065148 RUNCORN WEAVERSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065149 UTTOXETER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065150 NEWCASTLE-U-LYME CROSS HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065151 ROWLEY REGIS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065152 ROCHDALE (WARDLE) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065153 BIRMINGHAM EDGBASTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065154 RICHMOND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065155 RAWTENSTALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065157 PUDSEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065159 PENISTONE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065160 PADIHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065161 BIRMINGHAM BARTLEY GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065162 STOKE, LONGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065164 SHIPLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065166 MARKET WARSOP CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065168 BARTON ON HUMBER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065169 SHEFFIELD ECCLESFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065170 SOUTH SHIELDS, TYNE DOCK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065171 STOKE, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065174 STANLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065176 STAVELEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065177 BARNSLEY TOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065179 SHEFFIELD (BEAUCHIEF) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065180 BARNSLEY CARLTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065182 ST ANNES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065184 SOUTHPORT WOODVALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065186 WELSHPOOL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065187 SOUTH ELMSALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065188 LOFTUS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065189 RUGELEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065190 STOCKPORT BREDBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065191 BOLSOVER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065194 MARPLE CONGREGATIONA OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065195 LIVERPOOL, SPEKE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065199 LIVERPOOL, LITHERLAND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065201 MANCHESTER NEW MOSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065202 STAFFORD SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065204 LIVERPOOL, BROAD GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065206 ST HELENS SHAW STREET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065207 MACCLESFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065208 LIVERPOOL, KIRKBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065209 ST HELENS, SUTTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065210 LOUGHBOROUGH BLACKBROOK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065211 LINCOLN,BIRCHWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065212 SOUTH WOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065213 WOLVERHAMPTON, PARKFIELDS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065214 WOLVERHAMPTON, BUSHBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065215 BARNOLDSWICK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065217 Tamworth South Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065218 ASHINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065219 APPLEBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065220 ALFRETON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065221 ALCESTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065222 TAVISTOCK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065223 TOTNES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065224 ANDOVER, CHARLTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065225 TEWKESBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065226 WITNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065227 BANBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065228 SWANAGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065229 BANGOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065231 BASINGSTOKE, OAKRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065232 DARTMOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065233 HONITON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065234 EXMOUTH LITTLEHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065235 ISLE OF WIGHT NEWPORT WOOTTON CONGREGATION OF JEHO...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065236 EXMOUTH RIVERSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065237 LLANTWIT MAJOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065238 SWINDON, WESTLEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065239 SHAFTESBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065240 TALBOT GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065242 TITCHFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065244 TOTTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065245 WATERSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065246 WIMBORNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065247 TRELEWIS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065248 YATELEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065249 ABERAERON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065250 TROWBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065251 ABERGAVENNY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065252 TYWYN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065253 BRISTOL STAPLE HILL,CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065254 CAERNARFON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065255 BRISTOL SEA MILLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065258 CARDIFF CANTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065259 CHIPPING NORTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065260 CHIPPENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065261 NEWPORT SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065263 CALNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065264 DIDCOT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065265 BRIDGWATER, SEDGEMOOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065266 DINAS POWYS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065267 BRIDPORT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065268 EXETER PENNSYLVANIA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065269 BRISTOL, BEDMINSTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065270 BRISTOL, WARMLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065271 GLOUCESTER KINGSHOLM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065272 GLOUCESTER TUFFLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065273 BRISTOL, BISHOPSWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065274 ABERTILLERY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065275 CAERPHILLY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065276 ABERYSTWYTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065278 WOLVERHAMPTON PUNJABI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065279 BARGOED CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065280 DARWEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065281 BARRY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065282 SUTTON IN ASHFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065283 BASINGSTOKE FORT HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065284 WOMBWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065286 WARRINGTON LATCHFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065287 BRISTOL FILTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065288 WALLASEY SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065289 BRIXHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065290 HASLINGDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065291 BIRTLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065292 LONG EATON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065294 CHELTENHAM, LANSDOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065295 CHEPSTOW CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065296 CARDIFF, NORTH ROAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065298 CARDIFF EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065299 CHARD EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065300 CHRISTCHURCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065301 DURRINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065303 FISHGUARD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065304 CARMARTHEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065306 BOURNEMOUTH KINSON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065308 SWINDON CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065310 KEYNSHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065311 HOLSWORTHY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065312 NEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065313 BRIDGEND WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065316 MAIDENHEAD-BRAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065317 MIDSOMER NORTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065318 ST AUSTELL EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065319 RINGWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065320 REDRUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065321 ROSS-ON-WYE, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065322 TAUNTON PRIORSWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065324 YATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065326 PLYMOUTH CROWNHILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065327 ISLE OF WIGHT, NEWPORT-COWES CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065328 I.O.W. RYDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065329 MILFORD HAVEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065330 I OW SANDOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065331 BOURNEMOUTH ENSBURY PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065332 EVESHAM BENGEWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065333 BICESTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065334 BRACKNELL WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065335 MALVERN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065336 BATH, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065337 LYDNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065338 WOOL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065339 LLANELLI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065341 LLANDRINDOD WELLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065342 SOUTHAMPTON HEDGE END CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065343 LISKEARD EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065344 SWINDON DORCAN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065345 DEVIZES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065347 NEWQUAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065348 NEWPORT NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065349 ROSS ON WYE WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065350 KINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065351 KINGSBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065352 DROITWICH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065354 KIDDERMINSTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065355 CARDIGAN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065356 HORNDEAN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065357 BRISTOL KINGSWESTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065358 HENLEY-ON-THAMES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065360 HELSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065361 HAVERFORDWEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065362 HAVANT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065363 NEWBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065364 WINDSOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065365 WEYMOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065366 NEWTOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065367 WESTON SUPER MARE-SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065368 OXFORD COWLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065369 WESTBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065370 PENZANCE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065371 PEMBROKE DOCK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065372 VERWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065373 TORQUAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065374 PAIGNTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065375 TAUNTON VIVARY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065376 PETERSFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065378 PLYMOUTH, MUTLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065379 SOUTHAMPTON CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065380 PLYMOUTH, DERRIFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065381 READING TILEHURST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065382 POOLE, BRANKSOME CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065383 WELLINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065385 SWANSEA WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065386 READING PROSPECT PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065388 NEW MILTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065389 PONTYPOOL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065390 CARDIFF BAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065391 LYMINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065392 BRIDGEMARY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065393 OKEHAMPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065396 WESTON SUPER MARE NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065398 BRIDGWATER QUANTOCK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065399 CWMBRAN, HENLLYS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065400 BRECON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065401 CLYDACH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065402 BRACKNELL EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065403 BEWDLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065404 AMMANFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065405 EASTLEIGH, CHANDLERS FORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065406 SOUTHAMPTON BURSLEDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065407 FERNDOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065408 SOUTHAMPTON SHIRLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065409 FOWEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065410 SOUTHAMPTON WEST END CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065412 Portsmouth North Congregation of Jehovah`s Witness...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065425 LONDON, EDGWARE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065440 MAIDSTONE, TOVIL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065445 LONDON, PERRY HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065455 GLOUCESTER, TREDWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065460 EASTBOURNE, LANGNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065461 PORT TALBOT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065464 PONTYPRIDD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065468 TONBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065472 NELSON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065473 EXETER, HEAVITREE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065475 FALMOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065476 FAREHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065480 DAWLISH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065482 FARNBOROUGH EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065493 MILTON KEYNES, BLETCHLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065499 CROMER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065502 COLCHESTER NEWTOWN OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065508 COLCHESTER-PRETTYGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065518 CHICHESTER NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065525 CHICHESTER, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065528 CHESHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065533 BRIGHTON WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065542 BURNHAM-ON-CROUCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065546 BROADSTAIRS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065549 BRIGHTON NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065550 BEDFORD, KEMPSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065553 WAKEFIELD EASTMOOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065555 SEAFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065557 REDHILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065561 BRANDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065563 WOLVERHAMPTON - OLD FALLINGS CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065565 RAMSGATE, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065567 CHELMSFORD GALLEYWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065571 RAMSGATE, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065572 PORTSLADE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065574 NORWICH DRAYTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065576 NORTHAMPTON, WESTON FAVELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065583 NORTHAMPTON, ABINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065585 NORTHAMPTON, GOLDEN ASH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065588 MILTON KEYNES, SHENLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065589 MILTON KEYNES, WOLVERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065592 MILDENHALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065595 STANFORD-LE-HOPE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065597 ST ALBANS WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065602 RAYLEIGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065605 MARGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065608 MEDWAY, BLUE BELL HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065611 LUTON CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065615 MEOPHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065617 WREXHAM - WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065620 LONDON, STRATFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065624 LONDON GREEK CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065626 LUTON WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065628 BLYTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065636 LONDON UPTON PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065638 LONDON, MILL HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065643 LONDON, LOUGHTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065648 LONDON, LEA BRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065651 LONDON, LAMBETH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065652 LONDON, RICHMOND PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065659 BOLTON - ASTLEY BRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065662 BOURNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065664 BLACKPOOL , WEST PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065680 BLACKBURN, BLAKEWATER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065681 HAILSHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065683 NORWICH, EATON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065687 BISHOP AUCKLAND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065688 BIRMINGHAM WEST HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065689 LONDON, ISLINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065692 HASTINGS, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065694 HASLEMERE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065695 BURNTWOOD - CHASETOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065696 HARPENDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065698 HALSTEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065712 CLACTON-ON-SEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065714 BURTON-ON-TRENT HORNINGLOW CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065743 LONDON, HAINAULT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065746 LONDON, HANWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065749 LONDON, HARLESDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065758 LONDON, HACKNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065763 LONDON, ENFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065765 LONDON, ELTHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065769 LONDON, EAST ACTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065774 LONDON, DEPTFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065778 LONDON, DAGENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065783 LONDON, CLAPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065785 LONDON, CRAY VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065799 GOSPORT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065800 FELIXSTOWE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065801 BRIGHOUSE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065803 BRIERLEY HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065804 FARNHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065805 ELY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065806 BRIDLINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065807 EASTBOURNE, HAMPDEN PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065811 DUNSTABLE, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065813 BRIDGNORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065816 DARTFORD, HEATHSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065818 BRAMHALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065819 LONDON, BRENTFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065821 LONDON, BRENT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065824 LONDON, BERMONDSEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065825 LONDON, BARKINGSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065830 BRADFORD HOLMEWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065833 LONDON, BANSTEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065839 BLAYDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065843 BARROW-IN-FURNESS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065847 LONDON, AVERY HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065848 BARNARD CASTLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065849 GUILDFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065851 ASHBOURNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065852 GREAT DUNMOW CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065855 GRAVESEND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065856 LONDON, CHESHUNT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065860 LONDON, CHELSEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065865 HIGH WYCOMBE, CRESSEX CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065867 HEMEL HEMPSTEAD, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065870 HAYWARDS HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065873 HAVERHILL SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065876 HASTINGS, OLD TOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065877 HASTINGS, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065878 HASTINGS - NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065881 LONDON, CHADWELL HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065884 LONDON, BROMLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065887 LONDON, BRIXTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065891 DARTFORD, DARENTH VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065895 SAFFRON WALDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065896 KING'S LYNN, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065897 HORSHAM, ROFFEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065901 CHORLEY DUXBURY PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065912 CHORLEY ASTLEY PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065917 WELWYN GARDEN CITY, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065920 LEISTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065921 LEATHERHEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065926 HERNE BAY, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065929 FOLKESTONE, CHERITON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065931 CHESTERFIELD BRAMPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065933 BRACKNELL, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065935 WHITTLESEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065938 WATFORD, LEAVESDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065950 CHESTER DEESIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065953 ASHFORD, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065955 WITHAM, CHIPPING HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065957 BEXHILL-ON-SEA, LITTLE COMMON CONGREGATION OF JEHO...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065959 BASILDON, FRYERNS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065964 BASILDON, LANGDON HILLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065965 WATFORD, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065966 CHESTER NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065970 CARLISLE INGLEWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065973 WALTON-ON-THAMES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065974 CASTLEFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065976 LONDON MANOR PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH’S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065977 LONDON, CROYDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065978 HEMSWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065982 BEDFORD, PUNJABI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065986 LONDON, BETHNAL GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065991 LONDON, ACTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065994 LONDON, ABBEY WOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065998 STOURPORT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065999 BASILDON, VANGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066001 BEDFORD, FENLAKE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066003 ROTHERHAM, RAWMARSH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066006 BEDFORD, GOLDINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066012 BENFLEET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066016 SELBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066018 HEBBURN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066020 HEACHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066023 YORK - HEWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066027 CREWE SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066028 WESTGATE-ON-SEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066033 Letchworth Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066034 CRAMLINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066035 WARRINGTON, SANKEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066037 IPSWICH, PINEWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066038 COVENTRY FOLESHILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066040 HORSHAM, SOUTHWATER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066041 COVENTRY EARLSDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066046 HAROLD HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066047 COVENTRY COUNDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066049 WARRINGTON, ORFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066052 EMSWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066054 DUNSTABLE NORTH CONGREGATION OFJEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066058 Conwy South Congregation of Jehovah’s Witnesses
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066059 BRACKNELL SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066060 CLITHEROE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066061 CRAWLEY, IFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066064 CHERTSEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066067 BUCKINGHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066071 BASILDON, LAINDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066074 WALSALL, BROWNHILLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066076 DAVENTRY NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066077 DOVERCOURT STOUR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066078 KENDAL, HIGHGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066080 KEIGHLEY, AIRE VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066082 WALLSEND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066083 WAKEFIELD, KIRKGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066085 Halifax North Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses.
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066086 HORSFORTH EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066087 GUISBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066088 WORKSOP CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSESS
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066091 STRATFORD-UPON-AVON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066092 DARLINGTON, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066093 STOKE-ON-TRENT BUCKNALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066095 HOLBEACH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066096 CRAVEN ARMS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066097 HESWALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066098 HEYWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066099 HEXHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066100 DERBY, ALVASTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066102 WOLVERHAMPTON, CLAREGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066103 BURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066104 Tamworth West Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066105 DERBY, ALLENTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066107 DENBY DALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066108 LEEDS, SEACROFT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066109 WITHERNSEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066110 LEEDS, MOOR ALLERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066111 BRADFORD GREAT HORTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066112 LEEDS, MEANWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066114 LEEDS, HUNSLET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066115 FLEETWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066116 ELLESMERE PORT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066117 DENBIGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066118 EASTHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066119 CLEVELEYS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066120 DURHAM EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066121 WILMSLOW CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066122 MIRFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066123 DONCASTER, TOWN MOOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066124 WIGAN, ASHTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066125 KNARESBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066126 BOSTON - HAVEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066127 DONCASTER, BENTLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066128 WEST VALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066129 NORTHALLERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066131 LEEDS, HEADINGLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066132 NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066133 LEEDS, CROSSGATES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066134 DEWSBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066135 LEEDS, BRAMLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066136 NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, GOSFORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHO...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066137 DERBY PEARTREE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066138 LANGLEY GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066140 NEWARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066141 NEWBURN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066142 NEW MILLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066143 DERBY, MARKEATON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066144 MORLEY GILDERSOME CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066145 DERBY, CHADDESDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066146 GRIMSBY WEELSBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066147 RUGBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066148 OLLERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066149 Nottingham, Highfields Park Congregation of Jehova...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066150 LEYLAND, LONGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066151 KNUTSFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066152 CROOK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066153 COVENTRY, WYKEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066157 MAIDSTONE, ALLINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066159 BOLTON, ROSEHILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066160 LONDON, WALLINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066162 LONDON, WALTHAM CROSS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066164 LONDON, WALWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066169 GRANGE-OVER-SANDS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066172 LONDON TURNPIKE LANE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066173 LONDON, WEST HAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066176 GOOLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066177 LONDON, WILLESDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066179 OLDBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066180 LONDON, WOOD GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066183 BELPER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066186 LONDON, YEADING BROOK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066188 GAINSBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066189 BEDWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066190 LONDON, THORNTON HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066192 OLDHAM-CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066193 BARWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066194 OTLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066195 LONDON, TOLWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066196 LONDON, TOOTING BEC CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066199 WOLVERHAMPTON, PENN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066200 NOTTINGHAM BASFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066201 CREWE, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066202 NOTTINGHAM BESTWOOD PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066203 WALSALL, BLOXWICH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066204 NOTTINGHAM CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066205 NOTTINGHAM RUSHCLIFFE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066206 MILTON KEYNES, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066208 NORTHAMPTON, DUSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066209 NOTTINGHAM WEST BRIDGFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066210 GATESHEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066211 NORWICH, BOWTHORPE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066212 EDENBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066213 RIPON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066215 DERBY, MICKLEOVER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066216 BRIGHTON, WOODINGDEAN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066217 LEICESTER, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066218 BIGGIN HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066220 LOWESTOFT-PAKEFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066221 LONDON, PADDINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066223 REDDITCH SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066224 LONDON, SOUTHWARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066226 LONDON, HAMMERSMITH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066228 LONDON, CHISLEHURST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066231 HULL, HOLDERNESS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066232 RHYL, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066233 CRAWLEY, THREE BRIDGES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066234 RYE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066235 RETFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066237 MILTON KEYNES, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066238 NORTHWICH VERDIN PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066239 REDCAR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066241 MEDWAY, WIGMORE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066244 PETERBOROUGH, WOODSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066246 MALDON HEYBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066249 PETERBOROUGH BRETTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066250 PRESTON PENWORTHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066257 LONDON, PENGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066258 CARLETON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066261 LONDON, LEWISHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066263 PONTEFRACT. NEVISON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066264 PETERLEE, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066267 LONDON, ITALIAN SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066269 LONDON, HOUNSLOW CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066270 FAKENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066275 SOUTHEND-ON-SEA, SHOEBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066277 PILSLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066278 BURGESS HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066280 CATERHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066282 HAZEL GROVE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066283 LONDON, BRUCE GROVE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066289 GREAT YARMOUTH, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066290 REIGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066291 KETTERING, ISEBROOK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066297 LEICESTER NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066299 COALVILLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066303 ILKLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066304 BIRKENHEAD, CLAUGHTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066306 ST IVES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066307 WREXHAM EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066310 WINSFORD, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066311 WELLINGBOROUGH, HARDWICK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066312 KIRKHAM EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066313 WESTHOUGHTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066315 ASHFORD, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066316 WALSALL, SHORT HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066318 CANVEY ISLAND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066319 KENDAL PARKSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066320 WALSALL, PELSALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066321 DEREHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066322 STOKE, NORTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066323 UPMINSTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066324 SOWERBY BRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066326 DISS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066327 SOUTHPORT, HESKETH PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066328 Birmingham Shirley Congregation Of Jehovah's Witne...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066329 LONDON FRENCH CLAPHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066330 LONDON, ITALIAN NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066331 PENRITH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066333 SKELMERSDALE CONGREGATION
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066337 NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066339 LONDON, STREATHAM COMMON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066341 MORPETH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066348 LOWESTOFT, OULTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066351 NORWICH, THORPE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066354 LONDON, NORTHUMBERLAND PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066355 MANCHESTER, DROYLSDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066357 LONDON, NEW ADDINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066358 LUTTERWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066363 MANCHESTER, LITTLE HULTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066364 MANCHESTER, WHITEFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066367 IPSWICH KESGRAVE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066368 MANCHESTER, WITHINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066369 LONDON, UPPER NORWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066373 WYMONDHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066375 LONDON, NUNHEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066376 MANCHESTER, SALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066377 ILKESTON EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066378 London Portuguese Shepherds Bush Congregation of J...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066379 WISBECH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066384 LONDON, ROTHERHITHE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066385 HULL, SOUTHCOATES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066386 GT. YARMOUTH BRADWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066388 HULL-INGLEMIRE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066390 LONDON, SPANISH DOCKLANDS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066393 HOUGHTON-LE-SPRING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066394 LONDON, STONEBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066395 GREAT YARMOUTH GORLESTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066399 BIRMINGHAM, NECHELLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066400 LONDON, STREATHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066404 LONDON, NORTHWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066405 BRADFORD, UNDERCLIFFE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066406 LANCING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066407 MORLEY, TINGLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066410 LONDON, THAMESMEAD SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066412 LONDON, SWANLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066413 MEXBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066419 MANSFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066421 LONDON, SUTTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066423 MARYPORT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066426 MATLOCK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066429 LIVERPOOL, BELLE VALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066430 SOUTHPORT, BIRKDALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066431 IPSWICH CHANTRY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066432 IPSWICH WHITEHOUSE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066433 SOUTHPORT, CHURCHTOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066434 SCARBOROUGH, PEASHOLM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066435 HOLYWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSESS
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066436 HUDDERSFILED, COLNE VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066437 COLNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066438 IPSWICH CHRISTCHURCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066439 WEST BROMWICH, HATELEY HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066441 WALSALL, WILLENHALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066442 SHEFFIELD, HEELEY BROOK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066443 MANCHESTER STRETFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066444 THIRSK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066445 BIRMINGHAM, LOZELLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066447 MANCHESTER IRLAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066448 TELFORD, MADELEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066449 SHEFFIELD, CHAPELTOWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066450 STOKE, HANLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066451 PWLLHELI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066452 SPALDING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066453 MANCHESTER ECCLES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066454 SHEFFIELD, FIRTH PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066455 PRESTON, MOOR PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066456 SETTLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066457 HINCKLEY, MIDDLEFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066459 RUNCORN, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066460 MANCHESTER CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066461 ROSSINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066462 RAWDON CONGEGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066464 BOGNOR REGIS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066465 MALTBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066466 ALNWICK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066467 MOLD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066468 PICKERING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066469 NOTTINGHAM, CLIFTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066471 MIDDLESBROUGH CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066472 WEST BROMWICH, GREAT BRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066473 STOCKTON-ON-TEES GRANGEFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066475 STOCKPORT, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066476 STOCKPORT HEATON MOOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066477 Manchester, Salford Congregation of Jehovah's Witn...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066478 RUNCORN, HALTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066484 STAMFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066485 Leicester, Wigston Congregation of Jehovah's Witne...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066486 PRUDHOE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066487 SCARBOROUGH SOUTH BAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066488 SEAHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066489 LIVERPOOL, BELMONT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066490 OSSETT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066491 LEEDS, ROUNDHAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066492 NUNEATON, STOCKINGFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066493 HORWICH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066494 NEWTON AYCLIFFE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066495 BURTON-ON-TRENT, HILLSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066496 MARKET DRAYTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066497 WIGAN, PEMBERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066498 HUCKNALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066499 BIRMINGHAM, KINGS NORTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066504 SHEFFIELD, HILLSBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066505 SHEFFIELD, MANOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066507 SHEFFIELD RIVELIN VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066510 SHREWSBURY, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066512 SKEGNESS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066514 SOUTH SHIELDS, MARSDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066531 HOLYHEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066533 HORNCASTLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066535 HALESOWEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066538 GRANTHAM SOMERBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066541 FERRYHILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066545 EDGMOND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066550 DUDLEY, DIXONS GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066554 DONCASTER, BALBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066559 ULVERSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066561 TELFORD, IRONBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066563 STOURBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066565 Amlwch West Congregation Of Jehovah's Witnesses
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066569 BAILDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066574 HOYLAKE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066594 TELFORD, AQUEDUCT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066595 STOCKPORT, REDDISH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066597 PETERLEE, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066600 WHITCHURCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066603 THORNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066604 TELFORD, DAWLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066607 SCUNTHORPE, WESTCLIFF CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066609 HARTLEPOOL, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066612 BIRKENHEAD, TRANMERE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066617 Rotherham South Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesse...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066619 HINCKLEY, BURBAGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066620 SHEFFIELD, BIRLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066621 BECCLES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066623 BIRMINGHAM, PERRY BARR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066627 MALTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066628 HULL, HESSLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066631 CHESTERFIELD, BIRDHOLME CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066632 BIRMINGHAM, CHELMSLEY WOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066633 WIGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066634 SOUTHEND-ON-SEA, PRITTLEWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066635 WHITLEY BAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066637 WALLASEY, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066638 SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066639 SWADLINCOTE, GRESLEY PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066640 SOUTHEND-ON-SEA, PRIORY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066641 STOWMARKET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066642 STOKE-ON-TRENT MOORLANDS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066643 NEWHAVEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066644 NOTTINGHAM, BRAMCOTE PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066650 LOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066651 LONDON, BOREHAMWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066652 LIVERPOOL WEST DERBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066654 RUSHDEN SPENCER PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066656 WEST BROMWICH, TIPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066657 MEDWAY, GILLINGHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066658 BIGGLESWADE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066660 LUTON, STOPSLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066662 LEYLAND, FARINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066664 LONDON, NEW CROSS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066667 KEIGHLEY, WORTH VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066668 CAMBERLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066669 HUDDERSFIELD, LOCKWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066674 WORTHING, DURRINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066675 BIRMINGHAM, SMETHWICK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066676 MEDWAY, ROCHESTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066679 LONDON STANMORE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066681 PONTEFRACT, FEATHERSTONE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066685 HEMEL HEMPSTEAD, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066688 THETFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066690 LONDON, LEYTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066695 LONDON, CRAYFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066702 LONDON, PUNJABI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066704 DEAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066707 LONDON, HOLLOWAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066710 NORWICH, LAKENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066711 MILTON KEYNES, FENNY STRATFORD CONGREGATION OF JEH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066712 MEDWAY, CUXTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066717 CANTERBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066718 BISHOPS STORTFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066775 WREXHAM CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066777 SWADLINCOTE, GRANGEWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066778 LONDON, NORTHOLT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066781 HARROGATE DUCHY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066786 BIRMINGHAM, TILE CROSS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066789 STOKE, MEIR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066792 NOTTINGHAM, CARLTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066793 NORTHWICH, DANE VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066796 LONDON, WEMBLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066798 GRIMSBY, SCARTHO CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066801 BIRMINGHAM, YARDLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066802 BIRMINGHAM, WALKERS HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066803 WALSALL, WEDNESBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066805 LONDON, PONDERS END CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066807 LEEK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066808 HUDDERSFIELD, DALTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066810 HATFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066811 DRONFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066816 ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066877 SWANSEA MORRISTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066879 BASINGSTOKE BRIGHTON HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066880 BOURNEMOUTH, STROUDEN PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066884 CARDIFF, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066886 CHELTENHAM, PITTVILLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066889 EBBW VALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066898 DORCHESTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066929 HAYLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066930 PLYMOUTH, COMPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066931 ALTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066933 WADEBRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066934 PLYMOUTH, PLYMPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066936 EVESHAM, HAMPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066941 NEWTON ABBOT WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066944 WORCESTER, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066945 FROME CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066947 BRISTOL, EASTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066949 BARNSTAPLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066950 TRURO CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066951 CAMBORNE, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066953 TENBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066954 PORTLAND CONGREGATION
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066957 LISKEARD WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066958 WATERLOOVILLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066970 THORNBURY CONGREGRATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066971 ANDOVER, ANTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066976 BROMSGROVE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066980 REDDITCH EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066981 BRISTOL, REDLAND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066983 BLANDFORD FORUM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066990 BLACKWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067008 TIVERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067009 SWANSEA, GOWER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067011 LLANTRISANT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067012 BRISTOL SOUTHMEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067013 SOUTHAMPTON, MILLBROOK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067014 POOLE CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067015 SALISBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067016 CIRENCESTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067017 PORTHCAWL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067018 POOLE, CANFORD HEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067020 REDDITCH CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067023 LONDON, EARLSFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067024 LONDON, DOWNHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067025 LONDON, CAMBERWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067027 CAMBRIDGE, CHESTERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067028 CWMBRAN, PONTNEWYDD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067030 TUNBRIDGE WELLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067031 BLAENAU FFESTINIOG CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067032 HUNTINGDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067033 CHELTENHAM HATHERLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067035 LONDON, ALBANY PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067050 LONDON, BOUNDS GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067051 LONDON, EAST MOLESEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067052 LONDON, THAMESMEAD NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067056 LONDON, FRENCH NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067057 LONDON, ORPINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067062 LONDON, WOODSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067153 FARNBOROUGH WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067166 BRAINTREE SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067173 WITHAM, RIVENHALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067176 TENTERDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067179 CAMBRIDGE, GRANTA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067181 EASTLEIGH BISHOPSTOKE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067184 DURSLEY SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067185 CAMBORNE SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067187 EAST GRINSTEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067200 FAVERSHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067205 HERNE BAY, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067206 ROMFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067207 RUSTINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067209 CHARING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067216 TAMWORTH EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067220 STOKE, BIDDULPH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067221 BYFLEET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067222 BODMIN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067226 WORCESTER WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067227 WOKINGHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067228 BILLERICAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067241 TEIGNMOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067242 SWINDON PENHILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067244 SOUTHAMPTON PORTSWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067247 LONDON, WALTHAMSTOW CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067260 LONDON, STAINES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067261 HERTFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067263 CRAWLEY, TILGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067264 LONDON, FORTIS GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067266 LONDON, STAMFORD HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067268 LONDON, PERSIAN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067271 MEDWAY, CHATHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067279 LONDON, WEST WICKHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067284 MARKET HARBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067285 OCKENDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067287 HYTHE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067289 HULL, BOULEVARD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067290 FOLKESTONE, EAST CLIFF CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067291 BURNLEY, BRIERCLIFFE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067293 ROMSEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067294 LONDON, CHARLTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067295 LONDON, NORBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067297 MELTON MOWBRAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067298 LONDON, WOOLWICH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067299 LONDON, WEST NORWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067303 LONDON, SPANISH HOMERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067332 HECKMONDWIKE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067333 GOLDTHORPE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067334 GUISELEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067335 CHESTER-LE-STREET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067337 BURNTWOOD, CHASE TERRACE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067338 BOLTON, TONGE MOOR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067339 BIRMINGHAM, GREAT BARR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067340 ACCRINGTON-SPRINGHILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067341 YORK, CLIFTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067342 YORK, ACOMB CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067343 WOLVERHAMPTON, FINCHFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067346 SHREWSBURY, HARLESCOTT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067347 SCUNTHORPE, FRODINGHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067353 LONDON, KENSINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067357 SHEERNESS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067358 HEMEL HEMPSTEAD, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067360 LONDON, RUSSIAN WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067362 NORTHFLEET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067380 READING WHITLEY WOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067382 NEWPORT WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067383 ISLE OF WIGHT, FRESHWATER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067384 WINCHESTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067385 WELLS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067386 ST AUSTELL WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067387 PLYMOUTH, ST BUDEAUX CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067388 LAMPETER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067389 HEREFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067390 ABINGDON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067392 MAESTEG CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067393 BATH-EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067394 RUBERY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067395 POOLE, PARKSTONE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067397 NEWTON ABBOT EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067434 MIDHURST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067439 Luton-North Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067442 LONDON, STREATHAM HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067443 LONDON, WELLING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067455 LONDON , SPANISH VICTORIA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067457 LONDON, STOKE NEWINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067468 LONDON, BLACKHEATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067471 LONDON, MITCHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067473 LONDON, DULWICH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067475 LONDON, BATTERSEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067476 LONDON, MORDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067479 HAVERHILL NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067484 LEWES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067487 CAMBRIDGE, CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067502 SOUTHAMPTON, WOOLSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067503 STOKE, TUNSTALL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067504 WHITBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067505 ROTHWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067506 MORECAMBE, TORRISHOLME CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067507 DONCASTER, CARCROFT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067508 MABLETHORPE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067510 LEEDS, ARMLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067511 CARNFORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067512 HARTLEPOOL, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067513 BLACKBURN, ROE LEE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067515 Birmingham Hodge Hill Congregation of Jehovahs Wit...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067518 WALSALL, CALDMORE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067519 GLOSSOP CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067520 SUNDERLAND, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067521 SLEAFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067522 BEVERLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067523 LANCASTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067526 SUNDERLAND, ROKER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067527 OSWESTRY, CONEY GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067543 GODALMING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067577 LICHFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067578 LONDON, PLUMSTEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067585 WELWYN GARDEN CITY, DIGSWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067591 LONDON , HAMPSTEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067654 PETERBOROUGH, ORTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067656 LONDON, NEWBURY PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067657 NORWICH, SPROWSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067660 NUNEATON, WHITESTONE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067695 ATHERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067697 BERWICK-UPON-TWEED CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067698 PRESTATYN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067699 NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE, BENTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067701 MANCHESTER, CHORLTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067702 WELLINGBOROUGH, MIDLAND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067703 PRESTON, ASHTON PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067704 BIRMINGHAM, MOSELEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067706 ROTHERHAM, PARKGATE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067707 PETERBOROUGH, NEW ENGLAND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067708 NORTHAMPTON, KINGSTHORPE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067709 SADDLEWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067710 CONWY NORTH
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067711 HULL, SUTTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067712 LEIGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067713 HUDDERSFIELD, MARSH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067714 DAVENTRY, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067715 CARLISLE, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067894 LONDON, HARROW CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067911 PONTYBEREM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067933 AYLSHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067936 NORWICH, CATTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067937 STEVENAGE, NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067940 DOWNHAM MARKET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067942 NORWICH, MOUSEHOLD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067943 LONDON, PALMERS GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068105 PETERBOROUGH DEEPINGS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068112 LONDON SIGN LANGUAGE WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068157 CHESTERFIELD, WHITTINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068161 MINEHEAD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068162 BRISTOL, SPEEDWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068223 KILLAMARSH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068473 LONDON, CATFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068625 RISCA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068805 DUDLEY, SCOTTS GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068808 BURNLEY, BRUNSHAW CONGREGATION OFJEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068821 BARNSLEY ATHERSLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068825 WOLVERHAMPTON, BILSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068827 SUNDERLAND CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068932 OSWESTRY, GOBOWEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068933 DOLGELLAU CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068958 RHONDDA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069147 LONDON, FOREST HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069151 CHELMSFORD, CHELMER VILLAGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069169 SANDBACH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069172 SOUTHEND-ON-SEA, SOUTHCHURCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069581 LONDON PORTUGUESE BATTERSEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069582 MEDWAY, STROOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069583 LONDON, STOCKWELL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1069935 LONDON, ERITH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070026 BRIDGEND EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070136 LONDON, LEYTONSTONE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070137 LONDON, FRENCH EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070151 LONDON GREEK NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070167 LONDON, TAMIL SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070170 LONDON, CAMDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070302 LONDON, BECKENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070358 DOVER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070523 DURHAM, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070525 BIRMINGHAM, STIRCHLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070526 BLACKPOOL, LAYTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070527 EASTWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070528 ROCHDALE CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070529 LEICESTER, HEIGHTS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1072777 PLYMOUTH, DEVONPORT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1075657 BIRMINGHAM NEW OSCOTT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1075701 BIDEFORD TORRIDGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1075799 STEVENAGE CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1076064 PRESTON, AVENHAM PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1077164 BIDEFORD BAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1077219 LONDON MANDARIN NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1077960 LONDON, TAMIL EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1078632 MAIDENHEAD COOKHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1079001 LONDON, KINGSLAND CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1080531 HARLOW CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1082720 LONDON PORTUGUESE SEVEN SISTERS CONGREGATION OF JE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1083077 MANCHESTER FRENCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1083815 LONDON BUSH HILL PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1084071 SWANSEA GORSEINON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1084084 LONDON SPANISH STREATHAM PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHO...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1087201 HARROGATE GRANBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1089982 LONDON LINGALA NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1090426 COVENTRY PUNJABI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1090506 LONDON TWI WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1093795 GRANTHAM SPRINGFIELD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1095224 MANCHESTER SIGN LANGUAGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1095525 ST AUSTELL BAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1095832 TOWCESTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1095889 LONDON SPANISH SEVEN SISTERS CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1096094 LONDON SERBIAN CROATIAN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1096313 Y FALI CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1097297 LONDON, RUSSIAN EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1098167 CARLISLE EDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1098170 LONDON WANDLE PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1099879 DERBY SIGN LANGUAGE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1100804 WALMER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1101370 WELLINGBOROUGH MILLERS PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1101425 WARMINSTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1103197 London, Rippleside Congregation of Jehovah’s Witne...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1103698 BIRMINGHAM, FRENCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1103756 LIVERPOOL MANDARIN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1104559 LONDON SPANISH SHEPHERDS BUSH CONGREGATION OF JEHO...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1109220 LEEDS, MANDARIN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1109532 COVENTRY, FRENCH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1109777 LONDON TWI EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1113242 LONDON, MANDARIN SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1114183 LONDON SPANISH CRYSTAL PALACE CONGREGATION OF JEHO...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1114226 LONDON PORTUGUESE UPTON PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOV...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1114261 LONDON PORTUGUESE BURNT OAK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1115654 BRADFORD THORNTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1116564 LONDON, POLISH CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1116589 BOSTON WILLOUGHBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1116910 WREXHAM (PORTUGESE) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1117452 LONDON POLISH EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1117898 MANCHESTER, SPANISH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1117930 SUNDERLAND MANDARIN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1118219 LONDON TAGALOG CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1121043 HARRIETSHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1123154 MANCHESTER PORTUGUESE NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1124406 GOLBORNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1126687 LONDON, COLLIERS WOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1127519 LONDON, MANDARIN EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1128127 LONDON NUNHEAD GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1131818 LONDON WOOLWICH RIVERSIDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1131824 LUTON, STOCKWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1132358 LONDON, PURLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1132360 LONDON, WINCHMORE HILL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1132361 CLIFTONVILLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1132646 POOLE, ALDERNEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1134067 MANCHESTER, LINGALA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1137638 BRISTOL EMERSON'S GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1140399 LONDON SIGN LANGUAGE EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1156365 LEEDS POLISH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 254495 LONDON TWICKENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255311 SKIPTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 255557 LONDON FELTHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 259137 LIVERPOOL CROSBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 259902 LONDON POTTERS BAR CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 501072 TODMORDEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065122 WHITEHAVEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065140 NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE, HEATON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065156 TELFORD, OAKENGATES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065230 SWANSEA CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065243 LAUNCESTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065256 BANGOR, WELSH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065277 ALMONDSBURY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065305 BURNHAM ON SEA CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065307 AXMINSTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065314 MERTHYR TYDFIL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065340 PORTSMOUTH SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065377 SOUTHAMPTON SHOLING CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065395 NORTH WALSHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065397 MOUNTAIN ASH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065450 LONDON, BARNET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065501 CORBY OAKLEY VALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065644 WIGAN INCE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1065798 BUXTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066036 CONSETT CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066050 HARLOW NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066084 CLEETHORPES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066089 DARLINGTON, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066090 BRADFORD FAIRWEATHER GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066094 DARLINGTON, EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066101 DERBY, OAKWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066154 SCUNTHORPE, ASHBY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066197 LONDON, TOTTENHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066271 LONDON, COLINDALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066287 PULBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066292 LONDON, BALHAM CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066346 MORECAMBE, WEST END CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITN...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066353 MANCHESTER, OLD TRAFFORD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066380 HYDE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066440 BIRMINGHAM, STOCKLAND GREEN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVA...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066458 LOUGHBOROUGH MEADOWS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066463 LIVERPOOL, BOOTLE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNES...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066474 OLDHAM, ROYTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066593 WORKINGTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066625 MANCHESTER, MIDDLETON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1066937 LEOMINSTER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067019 STROUD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067168 WORTHING, BROADWATER CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067204 HARLOW, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067225 ST. NEOTS CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067232 BRENTWOOD CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067286 SITTINGBOURNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067344 STONE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067488 MAIDSTONE, SHEPWAY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067524 BIRMINGHAM, HARBORNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067528 MANCHESTER, FAILSWORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S W...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067586 MILTON KEYNES, NEWPORT PAGNELL CONGREGATION OF JEH...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067594 NEWMARKET CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067696 ROTHERHAM WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067700 MANCHESTER, WYTHENSHAWE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S ...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1067932 STEVENAGE, SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1068813 WOLVERHAMPTON, MERRIDALE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1070190 LONDON, WHITTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSE...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1080257 LONDON, ITALIAN WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WIT...
  • 04 March 2022: Funds received from 1113107 LONDON, LINGALA SOUTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WI...
  • 30 March 2022: Funds received from 1066391 PEARSON PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LONDON COMPANY OF KINGDOM WITNESSES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property