Trustees THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST

Charity number: 275946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD COOK Chair 28 December 2016
None on record
Alan Clinton Trustee 03 December 2018
None on record
DENNIS DUTTON Trustee 25 May 2016
None on record
JONATHAN COX Trustee 26 August 2015
None on record
STEVEN ABBOTT Trustee 20 November 2014
None on record
PAUL WADE Trustee 20 November 2014
None on record
STEPHEN RICHARD MORRIS Trustee
None on record