Governing document FULL GOSPEL BUSINESSMEN UK & IRELAND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 04/03/1978 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/1982 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN, IN THE UK AND IRELAND AND OVERSEAS, THE TEACHING AND PURPOSES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT RESTRICTING OR LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE SPREADING OF THE GOSPEL AMONG MEN OF BUSINESS AND OTHERS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.