Accounts and annual returns QUEDGELEY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 276047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window