Financial history QUEDGELEY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 276047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £80.88k £97.72k £76.33k £83.85k £59.66k
Total expenditure £95.06k £88.31k £66.45k £69.17k £41.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £34.03k