THE PUG DOG WELFARE & RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates throughout the UK through the trustees and a supporting team of volunteers to render assistance to Pug dogs in need for whatever reason by re-homing in previously vetted homes and providing immediate & essential veterinary care where required prior to said re-homing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 July 1978: Standard registration
- THE PUG DOG WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Jayne Greene RGN BSc MA | Chair | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne McDonald | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robin Green | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brown | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Dean | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Parke | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £470.06k | £265.19k | £237.69k | £522.10k | £160.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.76k | £271.31k | £240.20k | £257.15k | £267.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £426.84k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.68k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £331.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £253.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2024 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2024 | 245 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/02/1978 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 23/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF PUG DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION INCLUDING VETERINARY ATTENTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
13 Freeland Park
Wareham Road
Poole
Dorset
BH16 6FA
- Phone:
- 07753 628832
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window