Accounts and annual returns ASPECT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 276098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 October 2020 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 06 October 2020 244 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 February 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 February 2019 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 17 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window