THE AMELIA COOK GOSPEL HALL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund was established on 29th August 1980 for the administration of the Charity of Amelia Cook for the Gospel Work at the Gospel Hall at Tatsfield. Surrey. This includes the upkeep and repair of the fabric of the Gospel Hall at Farnborough and furthering the religious work of the Open Brethren in Tatsfield and Farnborough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 July 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER OLD | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|||
ADRIAN RICHARD ELMS | Trustee |
|
||||
DAVID ROGER HOWELLS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.83k | £9.48k | £9.97k | £9.48k | £9.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.49k | £5.02k | £5.43k | £5.31k | £4.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29/08/1980
Charitable objects
1. IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE GOSPEL HALL, AT FARNBOROUGH, AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES THEREIN. 2. IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS WORK OF THE OPEN BRETHREN IN TATSFIELD AND FARNBOROUGH.
Area of benefit
FARNBOROUGH AND TATSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 KENNEDY CLOSE
PETTS WOOD
ORPINGTON
BR5 1HP
- Phone:
- 01689811166
- Email:
- davehowells74@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window