Financial history 1ST ROWLANDS CASTLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 276124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.70k £12.24k £11.34k £64.63k £26.27k
Total expenditure £2.95k £10.29k £15.78k £64.69k £18.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.43k £1.18k £48.58k £24.31k