SIXPENNY HANDLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 276132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.13k £9.21k £6.78k £10.38k £8.76k
Total expenditure £10.18k £8.44k £7.06k £9.81k £9.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A