THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT LANCASHIRE INFANTRY MUSEUM

Charity number: 276150
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2021 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 March 2021 125 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 September 2016 On time Download