Financial history THE WILKINSON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 276214
Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £44.64k £48.19k £61.15k £63.64k £65.14k
Total expenditure £32.98k £52.86k £56.03k £76.30k £96.04k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A