Financial history THE DOMINICA (UK) ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £18.44k £24.96k £11.40k £15.12k £160
Total expenditure £19.24k £19.06k £15.26k £18.47k £227
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A