Accounts and annual returns CLUB 77 TETBURY FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 276328
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 08 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 20 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required