GOLDEN APPLE TRUST

Charity number: 276358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £201 £165.27k £633 £144 £138
Total expenditure £10.55k £35.64k £4.78k £1.66k £510
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A