JEANNE SAUNDERS CENTRE ('PENNY GOBBY HOUSE')

Charity number: 276384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.86k £2.59k £8.44k £3.70k £6.64k
Total expenditure £3.86k £2.59k £8.44k £3.70k £6.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A