Enable Ability

Charity number: 276422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £692.60k £735.51k £824.97k £1.18m £892.10k
Total expenditure £699.23k £754.07k £831.86k £1.08m £1.01m
Income from government contracts £429.21k £0 £494.44k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £418.72k N/A £593.24k £298.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.97k £13.30k £50.05k £80.34k £27.60k
Income - Other trading activities £149.70k £185.65k £0 £230.49k £36.59k
Income - Charitable activities £484.71k £487.71k £553.55k £824.02k £790.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47.22k £48.86k £42.60k £45.76k £37.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £178.76k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £699.23k £754.07k £831.86k £1.08m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £3.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0