RACHEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 276441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 25 April 2017 On time Download