ST JAMES SCHOOL HATCHAM DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 276478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.11k £4.13k £4.34k £4.48k £4.67k
Total expenditure £3.51k £2.74k £3.12k £5.01k £250
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A