THE LEATHER CONSERVATION CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre was established to co-ordinate and improve the knowledge, methods and working standards needed to protect and preserve leather objects for the benefit of the public, to promote research into leather conservation and to disperse knowledge through education and training. It has the more general aim to promote the conservation and restoration of leather objects for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA MIDDLETON | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Gilroy | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MYNORS FARMAR | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM TUSTING | Trustee | 10 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MIKE REDWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN PEBODY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.45k | £110.21k | £103.05k | £105.97k | £146.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.89k | £135.81k | £135.75k | £145.45k | £118.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/05/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/08/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST PUBLIC MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES AND THEIR DEVELOPMENT AND TO PROMOTE THEIR USE AND ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC. 2) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF OBJECTS MADE WHOLLY OR IN PART OF LEATHER, PARCHMENT OR VELLUM OF HISTORICAL OR ARTISTIC VALUE. 3) TO PROMOTE A PERMANENT ORGANISATION TO CO-ORDINATE AND IMPROVE THE KNOWLEDGE, METHODS AND WORKING STANDARDS NEEDED TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE LEATHER OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 4) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO METHODS AND TECHNIQUES FOR CONSERVING AND RESTORING LEATHER OBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND IN GENERAL TO PROMOTE BY ALL APPROPRIATE MEANS AN INTELLIGENT INTEREST IN, AND A DESIRE TO PRESERVE FOR POSTERITY, THE NATION'S HERITAGE OF FINE CRAFTSMANSHIP AND ITS PRODUCTS OF WHATEVER NATURE, IN ALL FIELDS IRRESPECTIVE OF OWNERSHIP BUT ESPECIALLY THAT OF LEATHER USE. 5) TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN PERSONS IN CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF LEATHER OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grosvenor Chambers
Grosvenor Centre
Union Street
Northampton
NN1 2EW
- Phone:
- 07956 091919
- Email:
- info@leatherconservation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window