Financial history ST MARY'S CHURCH (HITCHIN) PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 276501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £11.30k £3.95k £3.70k £792 £820
Total expenditure £9.86k £282 £20.66k £2.46k £360
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A