Financial history STELLA'S VOICE

Charity number: 276520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £701.25k £758.18k £911.15k £953.71k £1.07m
Total expenditure £739.61k £724.10k £902.06k £745.74k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £121.04k £122.94k
Income - Donations and legacies £85.89k £110.52k £194.99k £613.36k £392.86k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £72.08k £647.66k £716.16k £340.35k £680.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £543.28k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £278.57k £724.10k £902.06k £745.74k £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £461.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £16.79k £13.96k £10.75k £27.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0