Financial history BRIDGWATER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 276524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £16.20k £14.92k £14.79k £155 £1.51k
Total expenditure £17.89k £16.96k £13.15k £2.32k £3.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A