Trustees BRIDGWATER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 276524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carole Ann Collins Chair 05 October 2022
None on record
Sheena May Coats Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Susan Margaret Pow Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Jackie Ayres Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
TONY MILROY Trustee 13 March 2013
None on record
LESLEY ANNE BURGE Trustee
None on record