CHELMSFORD ST RAPHAEL CLUB

Charity number: 276564
Charity reporting is overdue by 1763 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 668 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 668 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1033 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1033 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1398 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1398 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1763 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1763 days