CHELMSFORD ST RAPHAEL CLUB

Charity number: 276564
Charity reporting is overdue by 1765 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £5.17k £1.96k £3.76k £2.93k £910
Total expenditure £3.75k £3.71k £4.05k £3.65k £2.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A