Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN GILPIN TRUST

Charity number: 276710
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 July 2022 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 26 July 2022 171 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window