Financial history THE JOHN GILPIN TRUST

Charity number: 276710
Charity reporting is up to date (171 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £45.58k £49.41k £69.01k £54.49k £50.22k
Total expenditure £42.09k £20.01k £65.02k £54.71k £48.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A