Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCES EX-POW ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 276762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.16k £624 £27 £27 £16
Total expenditure £2.52k £3.05k £0 £1.53k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A