Financial history 18TH SWINDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 276767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £34.43k £22.98k £35.11k £22.99k £52.84k
Total expenditure £35.03k £18.11k £30.44k £8.05k £42.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £15.43k £12.76k