TODDINGTON MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 276904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.32k £4.08k £4.23k £3.91k £1.21k
Total expenditure £3.93k £4.22k £4.31k £4.19k £534
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A