ST CEDD'S SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 October 2019 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 October 2019 145 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required