ST CEDD'S SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £9.77k £2.77k £30.45k £15.61k £22.51k
Total expenditure £2.56k £7.49k £27.73k £7.34k £7.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A