ST CEDD'S SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Park Trustee 09 February 2021 None on record
Rebecca Young Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Kim Gisby Trustee 08 September 2020 None on record
Sarah Hunt Trustee 01 June 2019 None on record
Tomilewa Platts Trustee 01 January 2016
WILDERNESS FOUNDATION UK Received: On time
Gillian Justier Trustee 01 June 2019 None on record
Natalie Griggs Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
Danny Keating Trustee 01 June 2019 None on record
Ciaran Griggs Trustee 15 March 2020 None on record
Lauren Hayes Trustee 01 December 2019 None on record
Charlene Adutwim Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record