THE RIDSDALE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants to Organisation that will, in the view of the Trustees, help it to meet one or more of its charitable Objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 08 December 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Bridges FCII | Chair | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anne Brown | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN CLAUDE SAUNDERS MCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.19k | £14.94k | £17.75k | £18.07k | £21.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.69k | £22.42k | £10.43k | £22.29k | £603 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE PARISH OF ST. PETER'S FOLKESTONE AND THE PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CATHOLIC TRADITION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH FOLKESTONE AND FOR THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH FOLKESTONE.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S FOLKESTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
211 Shorncliffe Road
FOLKESTONE
Kent
CT20 3PH
- Phone:
- 01000 000000
- Email:
- admin@ridsdaletrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window